Posted: May 16, 2020

Learning activities for May 19th to May 22nd:

-Students should continue to do 30 minutes of silent reading every day.

-If you don’t have books available, there are online books available on the website

tumblebooks.com . You can log in by using the username: Harcourt123 and the password: trial.

-There are also online books available on the website raz-kids.com. Click on “Kids Login” and type in the username MrScullyHarcourt. Students will then choose their name and type in their individual passwords. The following are individual student passwords:

Mason: Mason5

Mathew: Mathew5

Jada: Jada4

Liam: Liam5

Ziggy: Ziggy5

Zeemer: Zeemer4

Jaxen: Jaxen5

Jazlyn: Jazlyn4

Hailey: Hailey4

Cole: Cole4

Herron: Herron5

-Students should continue to try to do 60 minutes of physical activity each day.

-Every day this week from Tuesday to Friday, students should spend 20 minutes a day working on French activities on the website https://flora.nbed.nb.ca/ . The website contains guided French activities pertaining to speaking, reading, and writing.

-Tuesday and Wednesday, for 20 minutes a day, have students work on multiplying a multiple of 10 with another multiple of 10 (ex: 30 x 40). Explain that to solve this kind of problem, students can multiply the front digits of the factors and then add the number of zeros from both factors to the answer.

Ex: 4 x 3 = 12, so, 40 x 30 = 1200 (two zeros added to 12).

-Thursday and Friday, introduce students to the concept of multiplying 2 double digit numbers together (ex: 24 x 53). They should spend about 20 minutes a day working on the concept. Explain to students that to solve a multiplication problem involving 2 double digit numbers, they can multiply both digits of the first number with both digits of the second number. Explain that, for example, 24 x 53 means 24 groups of 53, which is the same as 20 groups of 50, plus 20 groups of 3, plus 4 groups of 50, plus 4 groups of 3.

So, 24 x 53 = (20 x 50) + (20 x 3) + (4 x 50) + (4 x 3)

24 x 53 = 1000 + 60 + 200 + 12

24 x 53 = 1272

NOTE: This is a grade 5 concept but grade 4 students can attempt these types of problems as well. Any student who is really struggling with multiplying two double digit numbers together, can return to working on the concept of multiplying a double digit number by a single digit number (ex: 24 x 3).

-Every day this week students should spend 20 minutes reviewing their 6 times tables and their related division facts:

6 x 1 = 6 6 ÷ 6 = 1 6 ÷ 1 = 6

6 x 2 = 12 12 ÷ 6 = 2 12 ÷ 2 = 6

6 x 3 = 18 18 ÷ 6 = 3 18 ÷ 3 = 6

6 x 4 = 24 24 ÷ 6 = 4 24 ÷ 4 = 6

6 x 5 = 30 30 ÷ 6 = 5 30 ÷ 5 = 6

6 x 6 = 36 36 ÷ 6 = 6 36 ÷ 6 = 6

6 x 7 = 42 42 ÷ 6 = 7 42 ÷ 7 = 6

6 x 8 = 48 48 ÷ 6 = 8 48 ÷ 8 = 6

6 x 9 = 54 54 ÷ 6 = 9 54 ÷ 9 = 6

6 x 10 = 60 60 ÷ 6 = 10 60 ÷ 10 = 6

6 x 11 = 66 66 ÷ 6 = 11 66 ÷ 11 = 6

6 x 12 = 72 72 ÷ 6 = 12 72 ÷ 12 = 6